Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB481 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Stephenson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 481
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of Farm-to-Market Road
 1301 in Wharton County as the Master Sergeant Mike C. Peña Memorial
 Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.103 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.103.  MASTER SERGEANT MIKE C. PEÑA MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a) The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 1301 in Wharton
 County between its intersection with the Matagorda County line and
 Richmond Road is designated as the Master Sergeant Mike C. Peña
 Memorial Highway. The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Master Sergeant Mike C. Peña Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *