E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3615
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1776
|
Journal Page: 5774
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5755
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 13, Section 9
|
Journal Page: 5772
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1039
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3372
|
Journal Page: 5462
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3424
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3132
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1845
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1427
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#710
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2705
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2637
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 2635
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2635
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 301
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 301
|
House
|
12/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|