Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB483 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill December 10, 2014

House Committee Report

Bill February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Witness List February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Bill May 7, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Witness List February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025

Enrolled

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill June 1, 2015

Conference Committee Report*

Bill February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015