Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB505 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez of Travis, et al. H.B. No. 505
 (Senate Sponsor - Estes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition of limitations on the number of dual
 credit courses or hours in which a public high school student may
 enroll.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.009(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The agency shall coordinate with the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board as necessary in administering this
 section.  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary concerning
 the duties under this section of a school district.  The Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board may adopt rules as necessary
 concerning the duties under this section of a public institution of
 higher education.  A rule may not limit:
 (1)  the number of dual credit courses or hours in which
 a student may enroll while in high school;
 (2)  the number of dual credit courses or hours in which
 a student may enroll each semester or academic year; or
 (3)  the grade levels at which a high school student may
 be eligible to enroll in a dual credit course.
 SECTION 2.  Section 130.008(f), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *