Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
House
|
12/15/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|