House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 549 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 549 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 336 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 336 | |
House | 12/17/2014 | Filed |