E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4757
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2115
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2115
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2115
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2115
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2115
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2114
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1845
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3144
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#923
|
Journal Page: 3143
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3143
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3143
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#884
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Coleman, Crownover, Pickett, Frullo, J. Rodriguez, Farias, Aycock, Otto, Burrows, More
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
House
|
12/18/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|