Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB56 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/10/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R2032 MK-D
 By: González H.B. No. 56


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to evaluate the English
 language proficiency standards used in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.067 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.067.  TASK FORCE ON ENGLISH LANGUAGE PROFICIENCY
 STANDARDS. (a) A task force is established under this section to
 evaluate the efficacy of the agency's English language proficiency
 standards for students in grades 9-12.
 (b)  The task force shall be composed of the following
 members appointed by the commissioner:
 (1)  five teachers who are certified in bilingual
 education, with appointments reflecting the geographic diversity
 of this state and including teachers from both rural and urban
 school districts;
 (2)  one representative of the agency with expertise
 related to the English language proficiency standards;
 (3)  one representative of the agency with expertise
 related to the Texas essential knowledge and skills;
 (4)  one central office administrator from an urban
 school district and one central office administrator from a rural
 school district; and
 (5)  one superintendent of a school district that has a
 proportionately high number of students of limited English
 proficiency.
 (c)  The member of the task force appointed under Subsection
 (b)(2) shall serve as the presiding officer of the task force.
 (d)  The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task
 force not later than December 1, 2015.
 (e)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before January 1, 2016. The task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to
 fulfill the task force's duties under this section.
 (f)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 (g)  The task force shall:
 (1)  examine the impact of the agency's English
 language proficiency standards on the achievement of students of
 limited English proficiency in grades 9-12;
 (2)  examine the impact of the Texas essential
 knowledge and skills on the agency's English language proficiency
 standards;
 (3)  evaluate the efficacy of the agency's English
 language proficiency standards for grades 9-12, with a focus on
 maintaining quality of instruction and full access to the Texas
 essential knowledge and skills curriculum;
 (4)  identify effective methods for incorporating the
 Texas essential knowledge and skills curriculum into the agency's
 English language proficiency standards for students in grades 9-12;
 (5)  examine the impact of the agency's English
 language proficiency standards on the achievement of students
 enrolled in special education programs; and
 (6)  examine the performance of students of limited
 English proficiency who are evaluated with the agency's English
 language proficiency standards against the performance of students
 who are proficient in English.
 (h)  The task force shall prepare a report that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the task
 force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and
 (3)  any proposals for legislation or other matters the
 task force considers appropriate.
 (i)  Not later than September 1, 2017, the task force shall
 deliver the report required by Subsection (h) to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 the chair of the State Board of Education, and the Bilingual/ESL
 Unit of the Division of Curriculum in the agency.
 (j)  The task force is abolished and this section expires
 December 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.