Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill December 19, 2014

House Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill May 4, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 1, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Enrolled

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill May 28, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015