LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB565
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB565
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB565
Compare Versions
HB565 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB565 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB565 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB565 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB565 Engrossed May 4, 2015
HB565 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB565 Introduced December 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB565 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB565 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB565 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB565 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB565 Engrossed May 4, 2015
HB565 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB565 Introduced December 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare