E | 06/09/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/09/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4774 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4466 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4108 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1854 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 957 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | RV#233 | Journal Page: 1599 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1435 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 371 | |
House | 02/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 371 | |
House | 12/29/2014 | Filed |