Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB577 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 577
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to pay, benefits and requirements for state active duty
 service members.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.212, Texas Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 437.212 (j) and (k) to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.212.  PAY, [AND] BENEFITS AND REQUIREMENTS FOR
 STATE ACTIVE DUTY, STATE TRAINING, AND OTHER DUTY.
 (j)  Claims of discrimination by service members on
 state active duty shall be processed in accordance with military
 regulations and procedures established for the Texas military
 forces; and are exempt from the jurisdiction of the Texas Workforce
 civil rights division.
 (k)  A member of Texas Military Forces called to state
 active duty is subject to the regulations established for continued
 membership in the specific component including but not limited to
 medical readiness, drug testing, physical fitness and training
 requirements.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect on September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *