E
|
05/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
E
|
05/06/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1282
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#282
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
House
|
01/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|