Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB593 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Collier, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 593
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; April 29, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to canine encounter training for peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer licensed by the commission on
 or after January 1, 2016, to complete a canine encounter training
 program established by the commission under Section 1701.261.  An
 officer shall complete the program not later than the second
 anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under this chapter
 unless the officer completes the program as part of the officer's
 basic training course.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.261 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.261.  CANINE ENCOUNTER TRAINING PROGRAM. (a) The
 commission shall establish a statewide comprehensive education and
 training program on canine encounters and canine behavior. The
 training program must consist of at least four hours of classroom
 instruction and practical training, developed and approved by the
 commission, that addresses:
 (1)  handling canine-related calls, anticipating
 unplanned encounters with canines, and using humane methods and
 tools in handling canine encounters;
 (2)  recognizing and understanding canine behavior;
 (3)  state laws related to canines;
 (4)  canine conflict avoidance and de-escalation;
 (5)  use of force continuum principles in relation to
 canines;
 (6)  using nonlethal methods, tools, and resources to
 avoid and defend against a canine attack; and
 (7)  a general overview of encounters with other
 animals.
 (b)  At least once every four years, the commission shall
 review the content of the training program under this section and
 update the program as necessary.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Sections 1701.253(l) and 1701.402(l),
 an officer who has completed at least four hours of a canine
 encounter training program is not required to complete the program
 under this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1701.402, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  As a requirement for an intermediate or advanced
 proficiency certificate issued by the commission on or after
 January 1, 2016, an officer must complete the canine encounter
 training program established by the commission under Section
 1701.261.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish the canine encounter
 training program as required by Section 1701.261, Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  Notwithstanding any other provision of this Act,
 an officer employed by a county with a population of less than
 125,000 is not required to comply with Sections 1701.253(l) and
 1701.402(l), Occupations Code, as added by this Act, before January
 1, 2017.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *