House | 05/08/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2955 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 173 | Journal Page: 2954 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 2914 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 7:59 AM | Journal Page: 2638 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2638 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 398 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 398 | |
House | 01/06/2015 | Filed |