E
|
06/19/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1801
|
Journal Page: 5855
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5847
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5694
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5694
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3445
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3445
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5514
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5514
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5514
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4981
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1164
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#400
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Otto
|
Journal Page: 1967
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1967
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|