LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB6
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB6
Compare Versions
HB6 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB6 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB6 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB6 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB6 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB6 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB6 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB6 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB6 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB6 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB6 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB6 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB6 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB6 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare