Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB601 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 601
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 7, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the premises covered by mixed beverage permits for
 certain county-owned facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 28, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 28.135 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.135.  DESIGNATION OF LICENSED PREMISES FOR PERMITS
 COVERING CERTAIN COUNTY-OWNED FACILITIES. (a) This section
 applies only to a facility that is:
 (1)  partially located in a municipality that:
 (A)  has a population of less than 40,000; and
 (B)  is located in a county with a population less
 than 70,000; and
 (2)  a county-owned civic center that consists of
 adjacent buildings not all of which are located in the municipality
 described by Subdivision (1).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, all buildings comprising
 a facility described by Subsection (a) may be designated as and
 considered the licensed premises for purposes of a mixed beverage
 permit covering the facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *