Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1004 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | RV#283 | Journal Page: 1717 |
House | 04/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1645 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1645 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1471 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 01/06/2015 | Filed |