Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB635 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 635
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of fetal remains.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.010.  DISPOSITION OF FETAL REMAINS. (a)  A hospital
 shall release the remains of an unintended, intrauterine fetal
 death on the request of a parent of the unborn child, in a manner
 appropriate under law and the hospital's policy for disposition of
 a human body.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), if the remains of an
 unintended, intrauterine fetal death weigh less than 350 grams, a
 hospital shall release the remains on the request of a parent of the
 unborn child, in a manner that is appropriate under law and
 consistent with hospital policy.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *