E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4335
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1860
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3986
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1267
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 V. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#320
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#311
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Raney
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
01/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|