LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB655
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB655
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB655
Compare Versions
HB655 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB655 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB655 Enrolled May 22, 2015
HB655 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
HB655 Engrossed April 22, 2015
HB655 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB655 Introduced January 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB655 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB655 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB655 Enrolled May 22, 2015
HB655 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
HB655 Engrossed April 22, 2015
HB655 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB655 Introduced January 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare