E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 792
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#201
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 791
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
01/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|