E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4624
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4625
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1474
|
Journal Page: 4624
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4624
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#181
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1062
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
|
|
Journal Page: 403
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 403
|
House
|
01/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|