LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB685
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB685
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB685
Compare Versions
HB685 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB685 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB685 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB685 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB685 Engrossed April 10, 2015
HB685 Comm Sub March 27, 2015
HB685 Introduced January 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB685 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB685 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB685 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB685 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB685 Engrossed April 10, 2015
HB685 Comm Sub March 27, 2015
HB685 Introduced January 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare