Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1309
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#528
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2356
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Walle
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#514
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 420
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 420
|
House
|
01/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|