Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB699 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nevárez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 699
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 2; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring public institutions of higher education to
 establish a policy on campus sexual assault.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9363 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9363.  CAMPUS SEXUAL ASSAULT POLICY. (a) In this
 section, "institution of higher education" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each institution of higher education shall adopt a
 policy on campus sexual assault. The policy must:
 (1)  include:
 (A)  definitions of prohibited behavior;
 (B)  sanctions for violations; and
 (C)  the protocol for reporting and responding to
 reports of campus sexual assault; and
 (2)  be approved by the institution's governing board
 before final adoption by the institution.
 (c)  Each institution of higher education shall make the
 institution's campus sexual assault policy available to students,
 faculty, and staff members by:
 (1)  including the policy in the institution's student
 handbook and personnel handbook; and
 (2)  creating and maintaining a web page on the
 institution's Internet website dedicated solely to the policy.
 (d)  Each institution of higher education shall require each
 entering freshman or undergraduate transfer student to attend an
 orientation on the institution's campus sexual assault policy
 before or during the first semester or term in which the student is
 enrolled at the institution. The institution shall establish the
 format and content of the orientation.
 (e)  Each biennium, each institution of higher education
 shall review the institution's campus sexual assault policy and,
 with approval of the institution's governing board, revise the
 policy as necessary.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9363, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2015 fall semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *