E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5471
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1722
|
Journal Page: 5471
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5471
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2317
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA11 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA2 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA10 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4107
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA7 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1164
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#399
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
8-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#388
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|