LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB7
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB7
Compare Versions
HB7 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB7 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB7 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB7 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB7 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB7 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB7 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB7 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB7 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB7 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB7 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB7 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB7 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB7 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare