House | 05/11/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3021 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 888 | Journal Page: 3021 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3021 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3015 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3015 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 7:59 AM | Journal Page: 2753 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 422 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 422 | |
House | 01/15/2015 | Filed |