Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2083
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#439
|
Journal Page: 2082
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2082
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2082
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#425
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
House
|
01/15/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|