Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB745 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 745
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the installation of solar-powered stop signs by a
 property owners' association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 430.002, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 430.002.  [SPEED FEEDBACK] SIGNS ERECTED BY
 NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION. (a)  In this section, "property owners'
 association" means an association described by Section 204.004,
 Property Code.
 (b)  A property owners' association may install a speed
 feedback sign or a solar-powered light-emitting diode (LED) stop
 sign on a road, highway, or street in the association's
 jurisdiction if:
 (1)  the association receives the consent of the
 governing body of the political subdivision that maintains the
 road, highway, or street for the placement of the sign; and
 (2)  the association pays for the installation of the
 sign.
 (c)  A property owners' association that installs a [speed
 feedback] sign under this section is responsible for the
 maintenance of the sign.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *