E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
E
|
05/18/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#181
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|