Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB795 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 795
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Haskell County Hospital District; authorizing the
 issuance of bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1040.052, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1040.052.  QUALIFICATIONS FOR OFFICE.  (a) A person may
 not be appointed as a director unless the person[:
 [(1)]  is a district resident[; and
 [(2)  owns land in the district subject to taxation].
 (b)  A person may not be appointed as a director if the person
 is:
 (1)  a district employee; or
 (2)  an employee of Haskell County.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1040.152(c), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Any district resident [taxpayer] is entitled to:
 (1)  appear at the time and place designated in the
 notice; and
 (2)  be heard regarding any item included in the
 proposed budget.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1040.153, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1040.153.  FISCAL YEAR. The district operates on a
 fiscal year established by the board [that begins on October 1 and
 ends on September 30].
 SECTION 4.  Section 1040.154(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The audit shall be open to inspection during regular
 business hours [Not later than December 31 each year, the audit
 shall be filed:
 [(1)  with the comptroller; and
 [(2)]  at the district's principal [district] office.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1040.155(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board by resolution shall designate a bank or banks
 [in Haskell County] as the district's depository [or treasurer.    A
 designated bank serves for two years and until a successor is
 designated].
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter E, Chapter 1040, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Sections 1040.207, 1040.208,
 and 1040.209 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1040.207.  REVENUE BONDS. (a) The board may issue
 revenue bonds to:
 (1)  purchase, construct, acquire, repair, renovate,
 or equip buildings or improvements for hospitals and the hospital
 system; or
 (2)  acquire sites to be used for hospital purposes.
 (b)  The bonds must be payable from and secured by a pledge of
 all or part of the revenue derived from the operation of the
 district's hospital system.
 (c)  The bonds may be additionally secured by a mortgage or
 deed of trust on all or part of the district's property.
 (d)  The bonds must be issued in the manner and in accordance
 with the procedures and requirements prescribed by Sections
 264.042, 264.043, 264.046, 264.047, 264.048, and 264.049, Health
 and Safety Code, for issuance of revenue bonds by a county hospital
 authority.
 Sec. 1040.208.  ADDITIONAL MEANS OF SECURING REPAYMENT OF
 BONDS. In addition to the authority to issue general obligation
 bonds and revenue bonds under this subchapter, the board may
 provide for the security and payment of district bonds from a pledge
 of a combination of ad valorem taxes as authorized by Section
 1040.202 and revenue and other sources as authorized by Section
 1040.207.
 Sec. 1040.209.  USE OF BOND PROCEEDS.  The district may use
 the proceeds of bonds issued under this subchapter to pay:
 (1)  any expense the board determines is reasonable and
 necessary to issue, sell, and deliver the bonds;
 (2)  interest payments on the bonds during a period of
 acquisition or construction of a project or facility to be provided
 through the bonds, not to exceed five years;
 (3)  costs related to the operation and maintenance of
 a project or facility to be provided through the bonds:
 (A)  during an estimated period of acquisition or
 construction, not to exceed five years; and
 (B)  for one year after the project or facility is
 acquired or constructed;
 (4)  costs related to the financing of the bond funds,
 including debt service reserve and contingency funds;
 (5)  costs related to the bond issuance;
 (6)  costs related to the acquisition of land or
 interests in land for a project or facility to be provided through
 the bonds; and
 (7)  construction costs of a project or facility to be
 provided through the bonds, including the payment of related
 professional services and expenses.
 SECTION 7.  Section 1040.053(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *