House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 6/1/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3018 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2642 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2641 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 01/20/2015 | Filed |