Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB798 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

                    84R18745 BEF-F
 By: González, Márquez H.B. No. 798
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 798:
 By:  Rinaldi C.S.H.B. No. 798


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of
 desert plants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.052.  STUDY OF METHODS TO PREVENT DESERT PLANT
 THEFT. (a) Not later than December 1, 2015, the commissioner shall
 appoint a task force to study methods to prevent the theft of desert
 plants from private property, including the following genera of
 plants:
 (1)  Agave;
 (2)  Ariocarpus;
 (3)  Echinocactus;
 (4)  Echinocereus;
 (5)  Ferocactus;
 (6)  Fouquieria;
 (7)  Mammillaria; and
 (8)  Yucca.
 (b)  The task force shall study the sale and transportation
 of desert plants and methods to prevent the theft of desert plants
 from private property. The task force may study the feasibility and
 effectiveness of:
 (1)  implementing registration requirements for
 persons who sell or transport desert plants;
 (2)  requiring persons who sell or transport desert
 plants to enter into a compliance agreement with a state agency;
 (3)  requiring persons who sell or transport desert
 plants to document the origin of the plants;
 (4)  authorizing a state agency to issue stop-sale
 orders regarding or to seize desert plants that do not comply with
 legal requirements;
 (5)  imposing civil, criminal, or administrative
 penalties for persons who steal desert plants and for persons who
 fail to comply with legal requirements governing the sale or
 transportation of desert plants; and
 (6)  taking any other action to regulate the sale or
 transportation of desert plants and prevent the theft of desert
 plants, as determined by the task force.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the task force shall
 submit to the house committees on agriculture and livestock and
 appropriations a report that includes recommendations for
 legislation to regulate the sale or transportation of desert plants
 and prevent the theft of desert plants from private property.
 (d)  This section expires December 31, 2016.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.