1 | | - | By: Sheets, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 821 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported |
---|
5 | | - | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | | - | to printer.) |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 821 |
---|
19 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
20 | 5 | | relating to the requirements of certain minors applying for a |
---|
21 | 6 | | hunting or fishing license. |
---|
22 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
23 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 231.302, Family Code, is amended by |
---|
24 | 9 | | amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-2) to read as |
---|
25 | 10 | | follows: |
---|
26 | 11 | | (c) Except as provided by Subsection (c-1) or (c-2), to |
---|
27 | 12 | | assist in the administration of laws relating to child support |
---|
28 | 13 | | enforcement under Parts A and D of Title IV of the federal Social |
---|
29 | 14 | | Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 601 et seq. [Sections 601-617] and |
---|
30 | 15 | | 42 U.S.C. Section 651 et seq. [651-669]): |
---|
31 | 16 | | (1) each licensing authority shall request and each |
---|
32 | 17 | | applicant for a license shall provide the applicant's social |
---|
33 | 18 | | security number; |
---|
34 | 19 | | (2) each agency administering a contract that provides |
---|
35 | 20 | | for a payment of state funds shall request and each individual or |
---|
36 | 21 | | entity bidding on a state contract shall provide the individual's |
---|
37 | 22 | | or entity's social security number as required by Section 231.006; |
---|
38 | 23 | | and |
---|
39 | 24 | | (3) each agency administering a state-funded grant or |
---|
40 | 25 | | loan program shall request and each applicant for a grant or loan |
---|
41 | 26 | | shall provide the applicant's social security number as required by |
---|
42 | 27 | | Section 231.006. |
---|
43 | 28 | | (c-2) For purposes of issuing a fishing or hunting license, |
---|
44 | 29 | | the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department is not required to request, |
---|
45 | 30 | | and an applicant is not required to provide, the applicant's social |
---|
46 | 31 | | security number if the applicant is 13 years of age or younger. |
---|
47 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 11, Parks and Wildlife |
---|
48 | 33 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 11.005 to read as follows: |
---|
49 | 34 | | Sec. 11.005. SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS OF CERTAIN MINORS. |
---|
50 | 35 | | (a) The commission may not adopt rules that require a person 13 |
---|
51 | 36 | | years of age or younger who applies for a license under Chapter 42, |
---|
52 | 37 | | 46, or 50 to provide the applicant's social security number. |
---|
53 | 38 | | (b) The commission may adopt a rule requiring an applicant |
---|
54 | 39 | | described by Subsection (a) or the applicant's parent or guardian |
---|
55 | 40 | | to sign a statement that the applicant is not an obligor subject to |
---|
56 | 41 | | a child support order. |
---|
57 | 42 | | SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2015, the Texas Parks |
---|
58 | 43 | | and Wildlife Commission shall adopt any necessary rules to |
---|
59 | 44 | | implement this Act. |
---|
60 | 45 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
61 | 46 | | to an application for a hunting or fishing license that is submitted |
---|
62 | 47 | | on or after January 1, 2016. An application submitted before that |
---|
63 | 48 | | date is governed by the law in effect immediately before the |
---|
64 | 49 | | effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in |
---|
65 | 50 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
66 | 51 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
67 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 52 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 53 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 54 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 821 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 55 | + | 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 56 | + | voting. |
---|
| 57 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 58 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 59 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 821 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 60 | + | 14, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 61 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 62 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 63 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 64 | + | Date |
---|
| 65 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 66 | + | Governor |
---|