Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB821 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheets, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 821
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 PerryX
 ZaffiriniX
 CreightonX
 HallX
 HinojosaX
 KolkhorstX
 RodríguezX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements of certain minors applying for a
 hunting or fishing license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 231.302, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-2) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1) or (c-2), to
 assist in the administration of laws relating to child support
 enforcement under Parts A and D of Title IV of the federal Social
 Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 601 et seq. [Sections 601-617] and
 42 U.S.C. Section 651 et seq. [651-669]):
 (1)  each licensing authority shall request and each
 applicant for a license shall provide the applicant's social
 security number;
 (2)  each agency administering a contract that provides
 for a payment of state funds shall request and each individual or
 entity bidding on a state contract shall provide the individual's
 or entity's social security number as required by Section 231.006;
 and
 (3)  each agency administering a state-funded grant or
 loan program shall request and each applicant for a grant or loan
 shall provide the applicant's social security number as required by
 Section 231.006.
 (c-2)  For purposes of issuing a fishing or hunting license,
 the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department is not required to request,
 and an applicant is not required to provide, the applicant's social
 security number if the applicant is 13 years of age or younger.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 11, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 11.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.005.  SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS OF CERTAIN MINORS.
 (a) The commission may not adopt rules that require a person 13
 years of age or younger who applies for a license under Chapter 42,
 46, or 50 to provide the applicant's social security number.
 (b)  The commission may adopt a rule requiring an applicant
 described by Subsection (a) or the applicant's parent or guardian
 to sign a statement that the applicant is not an obligor subject to
 a child support order.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the Texas Parks
 and Wildlife Commission shall adopt any necessary rules to
 implement this Act.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for a hunting or fishing license that is submitted
 on or after January 1, 2016. An application submitted before that
 date is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *