House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 01/22/2015 | Filed |