Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB872 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 872
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reactivation of a peace officer license;
 authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.316, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission shall reactivate a peace officer's
 license after a break in employment if the former license holder:
 (1)  completed at least 10 years of full-time service
 as a peace officer in good standing before the break in employment;
 (2)  meets current licensing standards;
 (3)  successfully completes:
 (A)  an online or in-person supplemental peace
 officer course of not more than 120 hours; and
 (B)  other in-person training requirements of not
 more than 40 hours;
 (4)  passes a peace officer reactivation examination;
 (5)  files an application; and
 (6)  pays any required fees.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1701.316(c), Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a license for which an application for
 reactivation of the license is filed on or after the effective date
 of this Act. A license for which an application for reactivation of
 the license is filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the application was filed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *