E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5207 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5212 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4764 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2321 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#919 | Journal Page: 3137 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3116 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3116 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 01/22/2015 | Filed |