E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 809
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#216
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
House
|
01/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|