Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB903 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Capriglione, et al. H.B. No. 903
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NelsonX
 HinojosaX
 BettencourtX
 EltifeX
 HancockX
 HuffmanX
 KolkhorstX
 NicholsX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 Taylorof GalvestonX
 UrestiX
 WatsonX
 WestX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the investment of a percentage of the economic
 stabilization fund balance in excess of the sufficient balance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 404, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 404.0241 to read as follows:
 Sec. 404.0241.  INVESTMENT OF CERTAIN ECONOMIC
 STABILIZATION FUND BALANCES. (a) The comptroller shall invest a
 percentage of the economic stabilization fund balance in a state
 fiscal biennium that exceeds the amount of the sufficient balance
 of the fund adopted under Section 316.092 for that biennium in
 accordance with the investment standard described by Section
 404.024(j).  The comptroller's investment of that percentage of the
 excess balance is not subject to any other limitation or other
 requirement provided by Section 404.024.
 (b)  The comptroller shall adjust the investment portfolio
 of economic stabilization fund money periodically to ensure that
 the balance of the fund is sufficient to meet the cash flow
 requirements of the fund.
 (c)  The comptroller shall include the fair market value of
 the investment portfolio of the economic stabilization fund in
 calculating the amount in the fund for purposes of Section 49-g(g),
 Article III, Texas Constitution, and Section 316.093 of this code.
 (d)  This section expires on the date Section 316.092
 expires.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *