E | 06/01/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/01/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6047 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1942 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3901 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 792 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1512 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#196 | Journal Page: 1511 |
House | 04/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 961 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 447 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 447 | |
House | 01/23/2015 | Filed |