Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB906 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paddie, Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 906
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications for appointment as a veterans county
 service officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.033(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  To be appointed as an officer a person must:
 (1)  be qualified by education and training for the
 duties of the office;
 (2)  be experienced in the law, regulations, and
 rulings of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
 controlling cases that come before the commission; and
 (3)  have the service experience specified by
 Subsection (c) or be:
 (A)  a widowed Gold Star Mother or unremarried
 widow of a serviceman or veteran whose death resulted from service;
 [or]
 (B)  the spouse of a disabled veteran who has a
 total disability rating based either on having a service-connected
 disability with a disability rating of 100 percent or on individual
 unemployability; or
 (C)  the spouse of a retired veteran who served a
 minimum of 20 years on active duty.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *