Senate | 05/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1458 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2859 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#775 | Journal Page: 2858 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2858 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2858 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#731 | Journal Page: 2737 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2737 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Sheffield | Journal Page: 2736 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |