Senate | 05/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1459 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2770 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#740 | Journal Page: 2769 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2769 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2769 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/7/15 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 2713 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2713 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 01/23/2015 | Filed |