Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB928 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 26, 2015

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 7, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Conference Committee Report*

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015