LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB928
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB928
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB928
Compare Versions
HB928 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB928 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB928 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB928 Engrossed May 7, 2015
HB928 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB928 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB928 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB928 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB928 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB928 Engrossed May 7, 2015
HB928 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
HB928 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare