E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1309
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#566
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#516
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 1(d)
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/1/15 12:25 PM
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 1(d)
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
House
|
01/26/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|